MO SB14 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 14-Pearce, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 14-Pearce, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures for the transfer of students from an unaccredited school district to an accredited school district in the same or an adjoining county
Title
Establishes procedures for the transfer of students from an unaccredited school district to an accredited school district in the same or an adjoining county
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 14-Pearce, with SCS | |
2011-04-21 | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-04-20 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - (0254S.05C) | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2011-01-05 | S First Read--SB 14-Pearce | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |