MO SB1390 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-15 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (5373S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-15 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (5373S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to workers' compensation administrative law judges
Title
Modifies provisions relating to workers' compensation administrative law judges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (5373S.02C) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2024-02-07 | Senate | S First Read |