MO SB139 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to state designations
Title
Enacts provisions relating to state designations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - House - House: BILLS IN CONFERENCE - CCS SS SB 139 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House: BILLS IN CONFERENCE - CCR SS SB 139, A.A. BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House: SB 139 (*HA 8, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 100 N: 32 NV: 8 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House: SB 139 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House: SB 139 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House: BILLS IN CONFERENCE - CCR SS SB 139, A.A. BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House: SB 139 (*HA 8, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 100 N: 32 NV: 8 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House: SB 139 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House: SB 139 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2023-05-10 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2023-05-10 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2023-05-09 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2023-05-09 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Bean) |
2023-05-05 | House | H distributes CCR--(0697S.04S) |
2023-05-03 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Bean, Hoskins, Trent, Williams, Razer |
2023-05-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Griffith, Boyd, Seitz, Smith (46), Nickson-Clark |
2023-05-03 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2023-05-03 | House | S refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 7, HA 1 to HA 8, HA 8 as amended, HA 9, HA 1 to HA 11, HA 2 to HA 11, HA 11 as amended, HA 1 to HA 12, HA 12 as amended, HA 1 to HA 13, HA 2 to HA 13, HA 13 as amended, HA 14, HA 15 & HA 16 and requests H recede or grant conference |
2023-05-02 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 16 H offered & adopted (Windham)--(0697S02.19H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 15 H offered & adopted (Smith-46)--(0697S02.32H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 14 H offered & adopted (Nickson-Clark)--(0697S02.14H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 13, as amended, H adopted --(0697S02.37H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 2 to HA 13 H offered & adopted (Weber)--(0697S02.57H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 13 H offered & adopted (Bosley)--(0697S02.54H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 13 H offered (Anderson)--(0697S02.37H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 12, as amended, H adopted --(0697S02.27H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 12 H offered & adopted (Wright)--(0697S02.53H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 12 H offered (Francis)--(0697S02.27H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 11, as amended, H adopted --(0697S02.40H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 3 to HA 11 H offered & withdrawn (Knight)--(0697S02.52H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 2 to HA 11 H offered & adopted (Gregory)--(0697S02.45H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 11 H offered & adopted (Baker)--(0697S02.44H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 11 to H offered (Schwadron)--(0697S02.40H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 10 H offered & withdrawn (Burger)--(0697S02.16H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 9 H offered & adopted (Davis)--(0697S02.10H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 8, as amended, H adopted --(0697S02.01H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 8 H offered & adopted (Byrnes)--(0697S02.41H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 8 H offered (Seitz)--(0697S02.01H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 7 H offered & adopted (Haley)--(0697S02.39H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 6 H offered & adopted (Cook)--(0697S02.04H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 5 H offered & adopted (Christ)--(0697S02.15H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 4 H offered & adopted (Dinkins)--(0697S02.03H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Morse)--(0697S02.18H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Seitz)--(0697S02.05H) |
2023-05-02 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Boyd)--(0697S02.07H) |
2023-04-25 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2023-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Veterans |
2023-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Veterans |
2023-04-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H Veterans |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred H Veterans |
2023-03-06 | House | H Second Read |
2023-03-02 | House | H First Read |
2023-03-02 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Perfected |
2023-03-01 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Bean)--(0697S.02F) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |