MO SB1388 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a sales tax exemption for certain nuclear facilities
Title
Authorizes a sales tax exemption for certain nuclear facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Razer [D] | Sen. John Rizzo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Perfected |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2024-04-23 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & defeated (Schroer)--(5414S02.08S) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-02-07 | Senate | S First Read |