MO SB1267 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Voted Do Pass S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Voted Do Pass S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the definition of "earnable compensation" as used by the Police Retirement System of St. Louis
Title
Modifies the definition of "earnable compensation" as used by the Police Retirement System of St. Louis
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled |