MO SB124 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments--SS for SB 124-Wasson, with HA 1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments--SS for SB 124-Wasson, with HA 1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to political subdivisions
Title
Modifies provisions relating to political subdivisions
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] | Rep. Kevin Austin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 124 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 124 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 124 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | S Bills with H Amendments--SS for SB 124-Wasson, with HA 1 |
2017-05-11 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2017-05-11 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Rone)--(0554S02.14H) |
2017-05-11 | House | HCS H defeated |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-08 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Economic Development |
2017-04-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Economic Development |
2017-04-11 | House | Hearing Conducted H Economic Development |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred H Economic Development |
2017-04-03 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-30 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-30 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Perfected |
2017-03-29 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Wasson)--(0554S.02F) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 124-Wasson |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |