MO SB120 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Bill Combined w/(SCS/SBs 119 & 120) (1076S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Bill Combined w/(SCS/SBs 119 & 120) (1076S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes post-traumatic stress disorder as an occupational disease
Title
Establishes post-traumatic stress disorder as an occupational disease
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | Senate | Bill Combined w/(SCS/SBs 119 & 120) (1076S.03C) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |