MO SB114 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-29 - Voted Do Pass S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-29 - Voted Do Pass S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that certain applicants for disabled license plates or windshield placards shall not be required to provide physician's statements for issuance or renewal of the plates or placards
Title
Specifies that certain applicants for disabled license plates or windshield placards shall not be required to provide physician's statements for issuance or renewal of the plates or placards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |