MO SB111 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 63 & 111)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 63 & 111)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a Prescription Drug Monitoring Program
Title
Establishes a Prescription Drug Monitoring Program
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Schaaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | Senate | Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 63 & 111) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Hearing to be Continued S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 111-Schaaf |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=296 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB111.pdf |