MO SB110 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the appointment and employment authority of the University of Missouri Board of Curators
Title
Modifies the appointment and employment authority of the University of Missouri Board of Curators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues Committee |
2015-03-02 | House | H Second Read |
2015-02-26 | House | H First Read |
2015-02-26 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 110-Schaefer |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |