MO SB1085 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1085-Pearce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1085-Pearce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the governing board of each public institution of higher education to enter into a memorandum of understanding concerning sexual assault, domestic violence, dating violence, and stalking involving students on and off campus
Title
Requires the governing board of each public institution of higher education to enter into a memorandum of understanding concerning sexual assault, domestic violence, dating violence, and stalking involving students on and off campus
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1085-Pearce |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | S First Read--SB 1085-Pearce |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=29027965 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB1085.pdf |