MO SB1022 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to off-premise sales by motor vehicle dealers
Title
Modifies provisions relating to off-premise sales by motor vehicle dealers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled |