MO SB1018 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (6324S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (6324S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits political subdivisions from adopting ordinances relating to the labeling, cultivation, or use of seeds or fertilizers
Title
Prohibits political subdivisions from adopting ordinances relating to the labeling, cultivation, or use of seeds or fertilizers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (6324S.04C) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | S First Read--SB 1018-Hegeman |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=75825628 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB1018.pdf |