MO SB10 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 10-Cunningham, with SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 10-Cunningham, with SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provision relating to the minimum wage
Title
Modifies provision relating to the minimum wage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 10-Cunningham, with SCS & SA 1 (pending) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-05 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered (Williams)--(0409S04.03S) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business and Industry Committee w/SCS |
2019-02-21 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee (0409S.04C) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 10-Cunningham |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |