MO SB10 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 10-Rupp
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 10-Rupp
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Denies unemployment benefits for those with outstanding overpayment penalties
Title
Denies unemployment benefits for those with outstanding overpayment penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Rupp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 10-Rupp | |
2011-04-04 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-17 | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor | |
2011-03-01 | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2011-01-05 | S First Read--SB 10-Rupp | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4065273 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB10.pdf |