MO HRB2467 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals obsolete, expired, sunset, and terminated statutory sections and portions of sections
Title
Repeals obsolete, expired, sunset, and terminated statutory sections and portions of sections
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Shaul [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - House - House: HRB 2467 HRBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 127 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (S) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 11, 2016, 1:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2016-05-02 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-04-28 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 127 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-28 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-25 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2016-04-25 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred: Government Oversight and Accountability(H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |