MO HR3329 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-25 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-25 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reserves the House Chamber for the Association of Electric Cooperatives on July 14, 2022
Title
Reserves the House Chamber for the Association of Electric Cooperatives on July 14, 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Rudy Veit [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-01-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-01-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2022-01-13 | House | Offered (H) |