MO HR321 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Adopted (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Adopted (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the House of Representatives to employ such employees necessary between May 15, 2015 and January 6, 2016 to perform the duties of the House
Title
Allows the House of Representatives to employ such employees necessary between May 15, 2015 and January 6, 2016 to perform the duties of the House
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Leara [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - HR 321 HOUSE RESOLUTIONS (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Adopted (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2015-04-21 | House | Taken Up |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred: Administration and Accounts(H) |
2015-02-05 | House | Offered (H) |