MO HR3208 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Approved (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Approved (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants the YMCA Youth In Government Program use of the House Chamber on Thursday, November 13 through Saturday, November 15, 2014, and on Thursday, December 4 through Saturday December 6, 2014
Title
Grants the YMCA Youth In Government Program use of the House Chamber on Thursday, November 13 through Saturday, November 15, 2014, and on Thursday, December 4 through Saturday December 6, 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | Approved (H) |
2014-05-13 | House | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HR3208&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HR3208I.htm |