MO HR12 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - HCS Adopted (H) - HCS AS AMENDED, HA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 110 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - HCS Adopted (H) - HCS AS AMENDED, HA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 110 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the United States Senate to confirm Scott Pruitt as Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency
Title
Urges the United States Senate to confirm Scott Pruitt as Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - House - House: HR 12 HOUSE RESOLUTIONS (Y: 110 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-06 | House | HCS Adopted (H) - HCS AS AMENDED, HA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 110 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-06 | House | Taken Up |
2017-01-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-01-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-01-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-01-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Offered (H) |