MO HJR98 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes a constitutional amendment regarding the right to life

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes a constitutional amendment regarding the right to life

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-05 - House - House: HJR 98 HJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House: HJR 98 HJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 110 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House: HJR 98 HJRs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 108 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House: HJR 98 HJRs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 112 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-12SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children(S)
2016-05-05HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2016-05-05HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 110 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 2
2016-05-05HouseTaken Up
2016-05-05HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2016-05-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2016-05-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-05-04HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2016-05-03HousePerfected (H) - AYES: 112 NOES: 36 PRESENT: 1
2016-05-03HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2016-05-03HouseTaken Up
2016-04-21HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2016-04-18HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2016-04-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-04-13HouseReferred: Select Committee on Social Services(H)
2016-04-13HouseReported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2016-04-12HouseVoted Do Pass with Amendments (H)
2016-04-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-03-29HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2016-03-07HouseReferred: Children and Families(H)
2016-02-24HouseRead Second Time (H)
2016-02-23HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback