MO HJR93 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment authorizing a downsizing state government commission
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment authorizing a downsizing state government commission
Sponsors
Rep. Caleb Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-02-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HJR93&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HJR0093I.PDF |