MO HJR9 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment authorizing the General Assembly to issue bonds to fund higher education facility improvements, construction, landscaping, and land or building purchases
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment authorizing the General Assembly to issue bonds to fund higher education facility improvements, construction, landscaping, and land or building purchases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred: Higher Education (H) | |
2011-01-19 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HJR9&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HJR0009I.htm |