MO HJR72 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of Missouri relating to property tax exemptions
Title
Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of Missouri relating to property tax exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-04-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Public Policy(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |