MO HJR58 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to reduce the amount of time a person is required to be a member of an organization in order to participate in the management of a bingo game
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment to reduce the amount of time a person is required to be a member of an organization in order to participate in the management of a bingo game
Sponsors
Rep. Wanda Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - House - House: HJR 58 HJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 141 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House: HJR 58 HJRs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 150 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House: HJR 58 HJRs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 150 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - voted do pass |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, May 3, 2016, 12:30pm, Bingham Conference Room |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 13, 2016, 2:00pm, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Progress and Development(S) |
2016-03-31 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-31 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-31 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-17 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-03-16 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 2 |
2016-03-16 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |