MO HJR50 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment prohibiting any person, employer, or health care provider from being compelled to participate in any health care system
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment prohibiting any person, employer, or health care provider from being compelled to participate in any health care system
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Ervin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-02 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-02 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-01-28 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred: Special Standing Committee on General Laws (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-04 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HJR50&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HJR0050I.htm |