MO HJR39 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment prohibiting any change by the General Assembly to a statute as approved by voters through the initiative petition process without a certain percentage of votes
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment prohibiting any change by the General Assembly to a statute as approved by voters through the initiative petition process without a certain percentage of votes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-20 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HJR39&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HJR0039I.htm |