MO HJR38 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment that establishes daylight saving time as new standard time
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment that establishes daylight saving time as new standard time
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2015-05-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-15 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred: Government Efficiency(H) |
2015-02-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |