MO HJR34 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions for the number of House of Representative and Senate districts
Title
Modifies provisions for the number of House of Representative and Senate districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2021-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |