MO HJR187 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Tax Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Tax Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to impose an appropriation spending limitation and to establish the "Tax Reform Fund" to be used to fund budgetary shortfalls, subject to an appropriation limitation, and allows for certain taxation changes based on revenue triggers, by general law
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment to impose an appropriation spending limitation and to establish the "Tax Reform Fund" to be used to fund budgetary shortfalls, subject to an appropriation limitation, and allows for certain taxation changes based on revenue triggers, by general law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tax Reform(H) |
2024-03-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |