MO HJR114 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to exclude proceeds from penalties and fines collected for human trafficking offenses from required distribution to the schools of the several counties according to law
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment to exclude proceeds from penalties and fines collected for human trafficking offenses from required distribution to the schools of the several counties according to law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - House - House: HJR 114 HJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-04-25 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2022-04-25 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Perfected (H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-04-06 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention(H) |
2022-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |