MO HJR104 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies constitutional provisions about elections and voting
Title
Modifies constitutional provisions about elections and voting
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House: HJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 102 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
House - House: HJRs PERFECTION-INFORMAL (Y: 104 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
House - House: HJRs PERFECTION-INFORMAL (Y: 104 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 102 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 3 |
2024-04-15 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Perfected (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-04-09 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2024-03-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-11 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |