MO HCR5 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to support importation of Canadian oil sands and ask for the approval of the TransCanada Keystone Coast Expansion pipeline
Title
Urges Congress to support importation of Canadian oil sands and ask for the approval of the TransCanada Keystone Coast Expansion pipeline
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Adopted (S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Taken Up |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2014-03-10 | House | Reported to The Senate (S) |
2014-03-10 | House | Adopted (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 14 |
2014-03-10 | House | Taken Up |
2014-02-05 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR5&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HCR0005I.htm |