MO HCR42 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - Adopted (S) - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 00
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - Adopted (S) - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 00
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Endorses the "Deaf and Hard of Hearing Children's Bill of Rights"
Title
Endorses the "Deaf and Hard of Hearing Children's Bill of Rights"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | Adopted (S) - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 00 | |
2012-05-03 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-01 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-17 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 17, 12:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-12 | Referred: Rules (S) | |
2012-04-11 | Reported to The Senate (S) | |
2012-04-10 | Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-26 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-26 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-19 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Referred: Special Standing Committee on Disability Services | |
2012-02-15 | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR42&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HCR0042I.htm |