MO HCR41 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages every school district in Missouri to promote and include trap shooting as a high school sport
Title
Encourages every school district in Missouri to promote and include trap shooting as a high school sport
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-27 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-27 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-22 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-04-22 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-19 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-19 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-19 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-04-12 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2011-03-01 | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR41&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HCR0041I.htm |