MO HCR4 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disapproves the salary recommendations of the Missouri Citizens Commission on Compensation for Elected Officials
Title
Disapproves the salary recommendations of the Missouri Citizens Commission on Compensation for Elected Officials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: HCR 4 HCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 154 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: HCR 4 HCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 154 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 25 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 6 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2017-01-23 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-01-23 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 154 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 1 |
2017-01-23 | House | Taken Up |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-01-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-18 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-01-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-01-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |