MO HCR29 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Approves the statewide mission designation in STEM for Harris-Stowe State University
Title
Approves the statewide mission designation in STEM for Harris-Stowe State University
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Riggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House: HCR 29 HCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 4, 9:00 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics(S) |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-14 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-14 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |