MO HCR25 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - Adopted (S) - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 00
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - Adopted (S) - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 00
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes the important services provided by professional school nurses and strongly urges school districts to recognize their dedication and valuable role by compensating them as specified
Title
Recognizes the important services provided by professional school nurses and strongly urges school districts to recognize their dedication and valuable role by compensating them as specified
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Allen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | Adopted (S) - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 00 | |
2012-05-09 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-08 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-05-08 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-05-07 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, MAY 8, 12:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-03 | Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics (S) | |
2012-04-02 | Reported to The Senate (S) | |
2012-04-02 | Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2012-01-30 | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR25&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HCR0025I.htm |