MO HCR23 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Adopted (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Adopted (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Declares support for Complete Streets policies and urges their adoption at all levels of government regarding the shared use of our roads and highways by motorists, bicyclists and walkers
Title
Declares support for Complete Streets policies and urges their adoption at all levels of government regarding the shared use of our roads and highways by motorists, bicyclists and walkers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Adopted (S) | |
2011-05-04 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-05-03 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-05-03 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-05-02 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-13 | Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics (S) | |
2011-04-12 | Reported to The Senate (S) | |
2011-04-12 | Adopted (H) | |
2011-04-07 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-09 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-03 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-17 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Referred: Transportation Funding and Public Institutions (H) | |
2011-01-31 | Offered (H) |