MO HCR22 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - Adopted (S) - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 00
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - Adopted (S) - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 00
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the Missouri Veterans Commission to work with the United States Department of Veterans Affairs to address the needs of women veterans and formally honors the heroic service of women veterans
Title
Encourages the Missouri Veterans Commission to work with the United States Department of Veterans Affairs to address the needs of women veterans and formally honors the heroic service of women veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | Adopted (S) - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 00 | |
2012-05-03 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-01 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-17 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 17, 12:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-03-21 | Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics (S) | |
2012-03-20 | Reported to The Senate (S) | |
2012-03-20 | Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred: Veterans (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR22&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HCR0022I.htm |