MO HCR18 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-17 - Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-17 - Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Department of Justice to investigate the price increase of propane gas
Title
Urges the United States Department of Justice to investigate the price increase of propane gas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2014-02-13 | House | Reported to The Senate (S) |
2014-02-13 | House | Adopted (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Taken Up |
2014-02-10 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2014-01-27 | House | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR18&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HCR0018I.htm |