MO HCR16 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes St. Joseph, Missouri, as the beginning of the Oregon Trail
Title
Recognizes St. Joseph, Missouri, as the beginning of the Oregon Trail
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |