MO HCR1 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-20 - Escort Committee - REPRESENTATIVES ALLEN, BRUNS, FAITH, HOBBS, KINGERY, LIPKE, SCHLOTTACH, SUTHERLAND, WALLACE, WASSON,ROORDA,RUCKER,JONES(63),SCAVUZZO,SCHUPP, STILL,SWINGER, TALBOY, WALSH AND ZIMMERMAN
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-20 - Escort Committee - REPRESENTATIVES ALLEN, BRUNS, FAITH, HOBBS, KINGERY, LIPKE, SCHLOTTACH, SUTHERLAND, WALLACE, WASSON,ROORDA,RUCKER,JONES(63),SCAVUZZO,SCHUPP, STILL,SWINGER, TALBOY, WALSH AND ZIMMERMAN
Summary
State of the State
Title
State of the State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-20 | Escort Committee - REPRESENTATIVES ALLEN, BRUNS, FAITH, HOBBS, KINGERY, LIPKE, SCHLOTTACH, SUTHERLAND, WALLACE, WASSON,ROORDA,RUCKER,JONES(63),SCAVUZZO,SCHUPP, STILL,SWINGER, TALBOY, WALSH AND ZIMMERMAN | |
2010-01-19 | Escort Committee - SENATORS SHIELDS, ENGLER, MAYER, BARTLE, NODLER, CALLAHAN, GREEN, BARNITZ, DAYS AND KEAVENY | |
2010-01-12 | Adopted (S) - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-01-11 | Reported to The Senate (S) | |
2010-01-06 | Adopted (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Adopted (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Offered (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR1&year=2010&code=R |