MO HCB7 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Attorney General to submit a monthly report detailing all activity concerning lawsuits filed against the Department of Corrections and the State Legal Expense Fund
Title
Requires the Attorney General to submit a monthly report detailing all activity concerning lawsuits filed against the Department of Corrections and the State Legal Expense Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - House: HCB 7 HCBs for THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S) |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-27 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-25 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2017-04-25 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-04-25 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-04-03 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
2017-03-30 | House | Reported for Introduction (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Voted to Introduce (H) |
2017-03-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-27 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2017-03-16 | House | Authorized - Delivered to the Committee on Corrections and Public Institutions |