MO HCB6 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to elections.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported for Introduction (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1 |
2019-03-28 | House | Voted to Introduce (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-25 | House | Authorized - Delivered to the Committee on Elementary and Secondary Education |