MO HCB14 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the designation of state highways
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the designation of state highways
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House: HCB 14 HCBs for THIRD READING (Y: 135 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: HCB 14 (HA 1 HA 2) HCBs for PERFECTION (Y: 94 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: HCB 14 (HA 1 HA 2) HCBs for PERFECTION (Y: 94 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-04-26 | House | Taken Up |
2018-04-24 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2018-04-24 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-04-24 | House | Taken Up |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-04-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-04-02 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-04-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-03-29 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
2018-03-29 | House | Reported for Introduction (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-28 | House | Voted to Introduce (H) |
2018-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-15 | House | Authorized - Delivered to Standing Committee on Transportation |