MO HB999 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-10 - Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-10 - Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding sexual offender registration
Title
Changes the laws regarding sexual offender registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence (S) | |
2011-05-05 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-05-05 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-05-03 | Perfected with Amendments (H) | |
2011-05-03 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-04-27 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-27 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-27 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-21 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-04-21 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-21 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-21 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-13 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-04-07 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety (H) | |
2011-04-01 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-31 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |