MO HB995 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-25 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-25 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions related to the operation of pet shops
Title
Creates provisions related to the operation of pet shops
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - House - House: BILLS IN CONFERENCE - CCS SCS HCS HB 10 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House: HB 995 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House: HB 995 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 96 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House: HB 995 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House: HB 995 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 96 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Do Pass Failed (S) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 18, 2023, 2:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S) |
2023-04-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-04-03 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 96 NOES: 56 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-03 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-04-03 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2023-03-28 | House | Perfected (H) |
2023-03-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-03-28 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-03-27 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2023-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H) |
2023-02-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-31 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |