MO HB976 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that any public, private, or parochial day care center, preschool, or nursery school must notify a parent, upon request, of whether there are any children attending who are not immunized
Title
Specifies that any public, private, or parochial day care center, preschool, or nursery school must notify a parent, upon request, of whether there are any children attending who are not immunized
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - HB 976 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 116 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - HB 976 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 135 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - HB 976 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 135 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 6, 2015, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2015-04-30 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 28, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children(S) |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-20 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 116 NOES: 34 PRESENT: 1 |
2015-04-20 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-20 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-15 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2015-04-15 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-04-15 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Social Services(H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-17 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |