MO HB971 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to disability benefits for members of the Missouri Department of Transportation and Highway Patrol Employees' Retirement System
Title
Modifies provisions related to disability benefits for members of the Missouri Department of Transportation and Highway Patrol Employees' Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-04-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |